EP0416517 - Non-glare pellicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gordon, Joseph S. 22 Dusinberry Road Gardiner, New York 12525 / US | 02 /
Golden, Kevin M. 76 Grove Street Newburgh, New York 12550 / US | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90116929.2 | 04.09.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | US19890403650 | 06.09.1989 Original published format: US 403650 | [1991/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416517 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416517 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416517 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
G03F1/62 (EP,KR);
G03F1/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | Nichtreflektierende Filmabdeckung | [1991/11] | English: | Non-glare pellicle | [1991/11] | French: | Opercule pelliculaire non réfléchissant | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 30.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0073087 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]US4657805 (FUKUMITSU YASUNORI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0300661 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) |