EP0416571 - Process for the electrochemical preparation, with the addition of carboxylic acids, of electroconductive poly (alkoxythiophenes) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldhues, Michael, Dr. Im Weiber 18 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | [1991/11] | Application number, filing date | 90117051.4 | 05.09.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | DE19893929690 | 07.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3929690 | [1991/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0416571 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0416571 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12, H01B1/12 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
C08G61/126 (EP,US);
H01B1/127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/11] | Title | German: | Elektrochemisches Verfahren zur Herstellung von elektrisch leitenden Poly(alkoxythiophenen) unter Zusatz von Carbonsäuren | [1991/11] | English: | Process for the electrochemical preparation, with the addition of carboxylic acids, of electroconductive poly (alkoxythiophenes) | [1991/11] | French: | Procédé de préparation électrochimique, avec addition d'acides carboxyliques, de poly (alcoxythiophènes) électroconducteurs | [1991/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 26.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 03.07.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP1026648 ; | [A]EP0328981 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0328982 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0328983 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | [A] - CHEMICAL PATENT INDEX, DOCUMENTATION ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, SECTION A, POLYMERS, DERWENT PUBLICATIONS LTD, LONDON, GB; AN=89-073459 & JP-A-1026648 (AGENCY OF IND SCI TECH) 890127, & JP1026648 A 00000000 |