EP0419906 - Core element and core for electrically heatable catalytic converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cornelison, Richard C. 11856 Kenyon Drive Hiram, Ohio 44234 / US | [1991/14] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117150.4 | 06.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | US19890406361 | 12.09.1989 Original published format: US 406361 | [1991/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419906 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419906 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, B01J35/04, F01N3/28 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
F01N3/2026 (EP,US);
B01J35/33 (EP,US);
B01J37/0244 (EP,US);
F01N3/2814 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
F01N2330/321 (EP,US);
F01N2330/38 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Kernelement und Kern für elektrisch heizbaren Katalysator | [1991/14] | English: | Core element and core for electrically heatable catalytic converter | [1991/14] | French: | Elément de noyau et noyau pour un catalyseur électriquement chauffable | [1991/14] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1994 | BE | 20.07.1994 | CH | 20.07.1994 | DK | 20.07.1994 | ES | 20.07.1994 | GR | 20.07.1994 | IT | 20.07.1994 | LI | 20.07.1994 | NL | 20.07.1994 | LU | 30.09.1994 | SE | 20.10.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
ES | 20.07.1994 | ||
GR | 20.07.1994 | ||
IT | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
GR | 20.07.1994 | ||
IT | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
IT | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 20.07.1994 | |
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 20.07.1994 | |
LI | 20.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3770389 (KITZNER E, et al); | [A]EP0117602 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0263324 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]); | [Y]US4928485 (WHITTENBERGER WILLIAM A [US]) |