EP0434906 - Securing during transport of a receptacle such as a container, trough or similar, which is detachable by means of an exchanging device arranged on the vehicle frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bock, Normann Zum Brook 48 D-28857 Syke / DE | [1995/13] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states EDELHOFF M.S.T.S. GMBH Heckenkamp D-58640 Iserlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bock, Normann Zum Brook 48 W-2808 Syke / DE | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, et al Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/27] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dr.Jur. Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Koppelstrasse 3 D-26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117270.0 | 07.09.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | DE19893942935 | 23.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3942935 | [1991/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0434906 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0434906 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434906 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
B60P7/13 (EP);
B61D45/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/27] | Title | German: | Transportsicherung für einen Behälter, wie Container, Mulde oder dergleichen, der mit einem auf dem Chassis eines Fahrzeuges angeordneten Wechselgerät aufnehmbar und absetzbar ist | [1991/27] | English: | Securing during transport of a receptacle such as a container, trough or similar, which is detachable by means of an exchanging device arranged on the vehicle frame | [1991/27] | French: | Fixation pendant le transport d'un réceptacle, par exemple un conteneur, une benne ou similaire. Ce réceptacle est amovible au moyen d'un dispositif interchangeable disposé sur le châssis du véhicule | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 23.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/07] | Request for further processing for: | 23.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 22.02.1995 | DK | 22.02.1995 | ES | 22.02.1995 | FR | 22.02.1995 | GB | 22.02.1995 | GR | 22.02.1995 | IT | 22.02.1995 | NL | 22.02.1995 | SE | 22.05.1995 | CH | 30.09.1995 | LI | 30.09.1995 | LU | 30.09.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2006/14] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
ES | 22.02.1995 | ||
FR | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
GR | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
NL | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2003/11] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
ES | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
GR | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
NL | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2002/24] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
ES | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
GR | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
NL | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
GR | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
NL | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
GR | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
LU | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
IT | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
DK | 22.02.1995 | ||
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
CH | 30.09.1995 | ||
LI | 30.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | BE | 22.02.1995 | |
GB | 22.02.1995 | ||
SE | 22.05.1995 | ||
FR | 21.07.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | FR | 21.07.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5722931 ; | [X]FR1543515 (BENNES MARREL); | [X]FR2155043 (DECAUVILLE SA); | [A]FR2497161 (DAUTEL EMIL GMBH [DE]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 86 (M-131)[964], 25. Mai 1982; & JP-A-57 22 931 (KYOKUTO KAIHATSU KOGYO) 06-02-1982, & JP5722931 A 00000000 |