EP0474897 - Planetary speed changing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES CO., LTD. 2-1, 2-chome Ohtemachi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [1992/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondoh, Masatoshi 95, Haneyama Yokonemachi, Obu-shi / JP | 02 /
Maruo, Toyoshi 2-A Battlefield Woods Ct. Chesapeake, VA / US | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117427.6 | 10.09.1990 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474897 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474897 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H1/32 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
F16H1/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1995/14] |
Former [1992/12] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE | Title | German: | Planetenübersetzungsgetriebe | [1995/20] | English: | Planetary speed changing device | [1992/12] | French: | Transmission planétaire | [1995/20] |
Former [1992/12] | Planetengetriebe mit veränderlicher Übersetzung | ||
Former [1992/12] | Transmission planétaire à rapport de vitesse variable | Examination procedure | 21.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 03.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61252934 ; | [A]GB2117081 (BRAREN RUDOLF); | [A]GB955097 (BRAREN RUDOLF); | [A]EP0087743 (PIERRAT MICHEL A); | [A]US4552037 (DISTIN JR ROBERT G [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 105 (M-577)(2552) 03 April 1987, & JP-A-61 252934 (NIPPON AIR BRAKE CO.) 10 November 1986,, & JP61252934 A 19861110 |