EP0419924 - Power steering for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahner, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Wiesenstrasse 25 D-7140 Ludwigsburg-Ossweil / DE | 02 /
Asch, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Hospitalstrasse 7 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | 03 /
Schieber, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Lerschenstrasse 28 D-7101 Untereisesheim / DE | 04 /
Schustek, Siegfried, Dr. Ing. Groeninger Strasse 48 D-7257 Ditzingen / DE | 05 /
Toberer, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Falkenstrasse 25 D-7132 Illingen / DE | 06 /
Breitfeld, Detlef, Dr. Ing. Kelternstrasse 12 D-7400 Tuebingen / DE | 07 /
Kleindieck, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Hoelderlinstrasse 21 D-7141 Grossbottwar / DE | [1991/14] | Application number, filing date | 90117444.1 | 11.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | DE19893931848 | 23.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3931848 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419924 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
B62D5/0439 (EP);
B62D5/04 (KR);
B62D5/0478 (EP);
B62D6/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/14] | Title | German: | Servolenkung für Fahrzeuge | [1991/14] | English: | Power steering for vehicles | [1991/14] | French: | Direction assistée pour véhicules | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/23] | 09.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4784234 (NAITO HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4809173 (FUKAMI MASANOBU [JP], et al); | [A]DE3617772 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]DE3824424 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |