EP0418707 - Comminuting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUGERÄTE UNION GMBH & CO., MASCHINENHANDELS KG Hardtstrasse 9 D-91522 Ansbach / DE | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Manfred Im Maierfeld 1, Hattenberg D-8832 Weisenburg / DE | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Sasse, Volker Parreutstrasse 27 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Sasse, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Parreutstrasse 27 D-85049 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117480.5 | 11.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | DE19890011149U | 19.09.1989 Original published format: DE 8911149 U | [1991/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0418707 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0418707 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B02C18/40, B02C18/18, B27L11/00 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
B27L11/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | Zerkleinerungsvorrichtung | [1991/13] | English: | Comminuting apparatus | [1991/13] | French: | Appareillage de réduction | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.09.1994 | DK | 11.09.1994 | GB | 11.09.1994 | ES | 12.09.1994 | SE | 12.09.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [1996/16] | AT | 11.09.1994 | |
DK | 11.09.1994 | ||
GB | 11.09.1994 | ||
SE | 12.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 11.09.1994 | |
GB | 11.09.1994 | ||
SE | 12.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/03] | GB | 11.09.1994 | |
SE | 12.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | GB | 11.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB885266 (LONZA ELECTRIC & CHEM WORKS); | [X]US3580517 (EHRLICH STANLEY V); | [Y]US3822042 (ROY R); | [X]US4015782 (GRANITE BERNARD H); | [Y]US4164329 (HIGBY PHILIP J [US]) |