EP0417779 - Substituted carboxylic acids as adjuvants for positive electrostatic liquid developers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Sayed, Lyla Mostafa 1143 Pynchon Hall Road West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US | 02 /
Page, Loretta Ann Grezzo 112 Hoseshoe Road Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
Pearlstine, Kathryn Amy 2134 Brandywood Drive Wilmington, Delaware 19810 / US | [1991/12] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1991/12] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 90117643.8 | 13.09.1990 | [1991/12] | Priority number, date | US19890408222 | 15.09.1989 Original published format: US 408222 | [1991/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0417779 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0417779 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/135 | [1991/12] | CPC: |
G03G9/135 (EP,US);
G03G9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/12] | Title | German: | Substituierte Carbonsäure als Hilfsmittel für positive flüssige Entwickler | [1991/12] | English: | Substituted carboxylic acids as adjuvants for positive electrostatic liquid developers | [1991/12] | French: | Acides carboxyliques substitués comme adjuvants pour des développateurs liquides électrostatiques | [1991/12] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1926918 (RICOH KK); | [Y]US4062789 (TAMAI TASUO, et al); | [Y]DE2642826 (HUNT CHEM CORP PHILIP A); | [YD]US4702984 (EL-SAYED LYLA M [US], et al); | [A]EP0282964 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0317969 (DU PONT [US]) |