EP0419961 - Method and circuit for replacement control, particularly for a system containing digital memory elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1994 [1994/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Breintner, Richard, Dipl.-Ing. Mobil-Oil-Strasse 47 D-8261 Ampfing / DE | 02 /
Wahr, Alfons, Dipl.-Inf. Pucher Strasse 52 D-8080 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | [1991/14] | Application number, filing date | 90117689.1 | 13.09.1990 | [1991/14] | Priority number, date | DE19893932082 | 26.09.1989 Original published format: DE 3932082 | [1991/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0419961 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0419961 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/12 | [1991/14] | CPC: |
G06F12/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1991/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Zuteilungssteuerung, insbesondere für ein digitales, speichernde Elemente enthaltendes System, und Schaltungsanordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [1991/14] | English: | Method and circuit for replacement control, particularly for a system containing digital memory elements | [1991/14] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de commande de répartition en particulier pour un système à éléments de mémoire numériques | [1991/14] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 01.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/38] | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3967247 ; | [Y]US4322795 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 18, Nr. 2, Juli 1975, Seiten 497-498, New York, US; D.K. CHIA et al.: "Self-checking page replacement control networks" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS, Band C-18, Nr. 7, Juli 1969, Seiten 644-651, New York, US: J.E. SHEMER et al.: "On the design of Bayesian storage allocation algorithms for paging and segmentation" |