EP0423540 - Steam generator for domestic and industrial use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.T.E.M. S.R.L. Via G.Guido Paglia 27 I-24100 Bergamo / IT | [1991/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carretto, Emanuel Via U. Foscolo 12/14 I-24010 Gorle, Bergamo / IT | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90118925.8 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | IT19890022084 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: IT 2208489 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423540 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423540 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0423540 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/28, D06F75/12 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
D06F75/12 (EP,US);
F22B1/284 (EP,US);
Y02P80/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | Dampferzeuger für Haushalt und Industrie | [1991/17] | English: | Steam generator for domestic and industrial use | [1991/17] | French: | Générateur de vapeur à usage domestique et industriel | [1991/17] | Examination procedure | 19.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 23.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.1994
12.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE NUOVA ROSSI S.r.L. Via Caduti di Navicello, 23 I-41030 VILLAVARA DI BOMPORTO (MODENA) / IT Opponent's representative Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.11.1994
12.12.1994
ADMISSIBLE NUOVA ROSSI S.r.L. Via Caduti di Navicello, 23 I-41030 VILLAVARA DI BOMPORTO (MODENA) / IT Opponent's representative Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 25 I-41100 Modena / IT | 15.12.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 07.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.02.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.05.1996 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.12.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.02.1994 | DK | 09.02.1994 | GR | 09.02.1994 | SE | 09.02.1994 | LU | 31.10.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
DK | 09.02.1994 | ||
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 09.02.1994 | |
SE | 09.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 09.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2247438 (GORTON CLYDE B); | [A]US2785272 (BALY HAL H); | [A]US3248813 (QUICK CARL F); | [A]GB2079908 (METAL SPINNERS IRELAND LTD); | [A]EP0069858 (FUMAGALLI LUIGI); | [A]WO8903496 (TERMOZETA ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) |