EP0440881 - Method for the optoelectronic monitoring of thread-shaped materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.08.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROSSENHAINER TEXTILMASCHINENBAU GMBH Dresdner Strasse 22/24, PSF 87 01558 Grossenhain / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states GROSSENHAINER TEXTILMASCHINENBAU GMBH Dresdner Strasse 22/24, PSF 87 D-01558 Grossenhain / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prager, Lutz Strasse der DSF 19 O-8280 Grossenhain / DD | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/33] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90118974.6 | 04.10.1990 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | DD19710003376 | 08.02.1990 Original published format: DD 337671 | [1991/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440881 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440881 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65H63/032, B65H63/06, D01H13/16, G01N21/88 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
B65H63/0324 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/33] | G01N21/88 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur optoelektronischen Überwachung fadenförmiger Materialien | [1991/33] | English: | Method for the optoelectronic monitoring of thread-shaped materials | [1991/33] | French: | Procédé pour la surveillance de matériaux en forme de fils par des moyens opto-électroniques | [1991/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/09] | 10.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/38] | 06.05.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   03.01.1994 | 31.10.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3635267 ; | [A]DE2933297 ; | [AP]DE3938934 |