EP0422608 - Optical fiber ribbon fusion-splicing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 28.05.1997 [1997/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKURA LTD. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Kohto-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states FUJIKURA Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome, Kohto-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onodera, Tsutomu Fujikuradensen-Matsugaoka-Ryo, 188-4, Joh Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Takeshi 1507-36, Kamishizu Sakura-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Taya, Hiroyuki Fujikura-Shataku 1-104, 1657-2, Kashiwai-cho Chiba-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119410.0 | 10.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | JP19890267683 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26768389 | [1991/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0422608 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0422608 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/255, G01B11/27 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
G02B6/2551 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/16] | G02B6/255 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Lichtbogen-Spleissen von faseroptischen Flachbandkabeln | [1991/16] | English: | Optical fiber ribbon fusion-splicing device | [1991/16] | French: | Dispositif pour la soudure par arc électrique de rubans de fibres optiques | [1991/16] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 04.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1997/22] | 17.12.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.12.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0321947 ; | [A]JP62189409 | [A] - EP-A-0 321 947, & EP0321947 A 00000000 | [A] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS, INFORMATION vol. E72, no. 9, September 1989, TOKYO JP pages 970 - 978; MIYAUCHI M. ET AL: 'Fully Automatic and High -Speed Splicing Machine for Optical Fiber Ribbons' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 42 (P-663)(2889) 6 February 1988 & JP-A-62 189 409 ( NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH ) 19 August 1987, & JP62189409 A 19870819 |