EP0425856 - Fuel assembly and rod for optimal fuel utilization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen, Tho Quoc 63 Barri Drive Irwin, Pennsylvania 15642 / US | 02 /
Casadei, Alberto Luiz 2128 Berkshire Drive Monroeville, Pennsylvania 15146 / US | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Buchenweg 17 86573 Obergriesbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gallo, Wolfgang, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Ludwigstrasse 26 86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Gallo, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. (FH), et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. L. Fleuchaus Dipl.-Phys. H. Schroeter Dipl.-Ing K. Lehmann, Dipl.-Ing.W. Wehser Dipl.-Ing. R. Holzer, Dipl.-Ing.(FH) W. Gallo Ludwigstrasse 26 D-86152 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/19] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Helmut Schroeter, Klaus Lehmann, Wulf Wehser, Rupprecht Holzer, Wolfgang Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119468.8 | 11.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | US19890431355 | 03.11.1989 Original published format: US 431355 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0425856 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/326 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
G21C3/326 (EP,US);
G21C3/30 (KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Kernbrennstabbündel und Stab zur optimalen Brennstoffausnutzung | [1991/19] | English: | Fuel assembly and rod for optimal fuel utilization | [1991/19] | French: | Assemblage et barreau de combustible pour utilisation optimale de combustible | [1991/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/35] | 14.04.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2582138 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]); | [A]US3151035 (MARK WYATT LESLIE); | [A]GB903142 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]EP0221641 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) |