EP0423625 - Tripod for use with a camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Kohichi c/o Konica Corporation, 2970 Ichikawa-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119541.2 | 11.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | JP19890267187 | 14.10.1989 Original published format: JP 26718789 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423625 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0423625 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/40 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
F16M11/40 (EP,US);
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1994/10] |
Former [1991/17] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Dreibeiniges Stativ für eine Kamera | [1994/29] | English: | Tripod for use with a camera | [1991/17] | French: | Trépied pour un appareil photographique | [1994/29] |
Former [1991/17] | Dreibeiniges Stativ für Kamera | ||
Former [1991/17] | Trépied pour appareil photographique | Examination procedure | 14.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/50] | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1179211 (HEER & CO [CH], et al); | [Y]DE3011798 (SCHILLER NORBERT DIPL ING); | [Y]US2684822 (ODIN EUGENE A); | [Y]DE320067 (KRAFT PAUL); | [A]US2111368 (SAUL KRON) |