EP0423651 - Method for manufacturing a circuit configuration, and circuit configuration on a carrier foil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOBE PROPERTIES LIMITED Capco House, 31/37 North Quay Douglas, Isle of Man British Isles / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states KOBE PROPERTIES LIMITED Capco House, 31/37 North Quay Douglas, Isle of Man, British Isles / GB | ||
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Pichl, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Seehalden Strasse 17 CH-8802 Kilchberg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Kurt F. Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Büchel, Kurt F., Dr. Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 90119630.3 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | CH19890003818 | 20.10.1989 Original published format: CH 381889 | [1991/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0423651 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/20, H05K3/04, G08B13/24 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
G08B13/242 (EP,US);
G08B13/2437 (EP,US);
G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US);
H05K3/041 (EP,US);
H05K3/046 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0108 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0156 (EP,US);
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
Y10S29/037 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49007 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schaltungsanordnung, sowie Schaltungsanordnung auf einer Trägerfolie | [1991/17] | English: | Method for manufacturing a circuit configuration, and circuit configuration on a carrier foil | [1991/17] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une configuration de circuit, ainsi que configuration de circuit sur une feuille de support | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/37] | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0292827 (DURGO AG [CH]); | [A]US2969300 (FRANZ ADA L); | [A]US3301730 (LAZARUS SPIWAK, et al); | [AD]EP0063347 (IRION & VOSSELER [DE]); | [AD]US3678577 (WEGLIN WALTER, et al); | [AD]DE3732825 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]) |