EP0462313 - Table with folding legs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.1993 [1993/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAKOB GAUGER SÖHNE STUHL- U. TISCHFABRIK INNENAUSBAU GMBH & Co. Zeppelinstrasse 1 D-7406 Mössingen / DE | [1991/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gauger, Bernd Zeppelinstrasse 1 W-7406 Mössingen / DE | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Möbus, Rudolf Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Hindenburgstrasse 65 D-72762 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119970.3 | 18.10.1990 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | DE19900002759U | 09.03.1990 Original published format: DE 9002759 U | [1991/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0462313 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0462313 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A47B3/00 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
A47B3/0913 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/52] | Title | German: | Tisch mit klappbaren Tischbeinen | [1991/52] | English: | Table with folding legs | [1991/52] | French: | Table à pieds pliants | [1991/52] | File destroyed: | 28.09.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/18] | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0278796 |