EP0424801 - Method for measuring the conductivity of milk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/18] | Method and apparatus for measuring the conductivity of milk | ||
[1993/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lang Apparatebau GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 83313 Siegsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | For all designated states LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH Raiffeisenstrasse 7 D-83313 Siegsdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Georg F. Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 22 W-8240 Berchtesgaden / DE | 02 /
Helminger, Karl Ulrichshögl 6 W-8229 Ainring / DE | 03 /
Scheurl, Robert Kienau 4 W-8221 Inzell / DE | 04 /
Wurm, Herbert St. Johann 11 W-8227 Siegsdorf / DE | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Wilk, Hans-Christoph C/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Wilk, Hans-Christof, Dr. c/o Henkel KGaA TTP/Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90119983.6 | 18.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | DE19893935759 | 27.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3935759 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0424801 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424801 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/04, A01J7/00, G01N33/04 | [1991/18] | CPC: |
A01J5/0133 (EP);
A01J5/0138 (EP);
A01J5/041 (EP);
A01J7/00 (EP);
G01N33/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Messung der elektrischen Leitfähigkeit von Milch | [1993/47] | English: | Method for measuring the conductivity of milk | [1993/47] | French: | Procédé pour la mesure de la conductivité du lait | [1993/47] |
Former [1991/18] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Messung der elektrischen Leitfähigkeit von Milch | ||
Former [1991/18] | Method and apparatus for measuring the conductivity of milk | ||
Former [1991/18] | Procédé et dispositif pour la mesure de la conductivité du lait | Examination procedure | 05.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.11.1993 | [1998/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3566841 (GERRISH JOHN B, et al); | [A]DE3308361 (WTW WEILHEIM [DE]); | [A]EP0223536 (AMBIC EQUIP LTD [GB]) | [Y] - TRANSACTIONS OF THE ASEA, Band 27, Nr. 4, Juli/August 1984, Seiten 1204-1210, St. Joseph, Michigan, US; A.K. DATTA et al.: "Real time acquisition and analysis of milk conductivity data" |