EP0423793 - Nozzle for continuous casting and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI STEEL CORPORATION No. 1-28, 1-Chome Kitahonmachi-Dori Chuo-Ku, Kobe-City Hyogo 651 / JP | [1991/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Mitsuo, c/o Technical Research Div. Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasakicho Chiba-shi, Chiba 260 / JP | 02 /
Sorimachi, Kenichi, c/o Technical Research Div. Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasakicho Chiba-shi, Chiba 260 / JP | 03 /
Sakuraya, Toshikazu, c/o Technical Research Div. Kawasaki Steel Corporation, 1, Kawasakicho Chiba-shi, Chiba 260 / JP | [1991/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120008.9 | 18.10.1990 | [1991/17] | Priority number, date | JP19890270322 | 19.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27032289 | JP19900233210 | 05.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23321090 | [1991/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0423793 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0423793 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/54, C04B35/58 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
B22D11/10 (KR);
B22D41/54 (EP,US);
C04B35/583 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
C04B35/66 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/17] | B22D41/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/17] | Title | German: | Giessrohr zum Stranggiessen und Verfahren zur seiner Herstellung | [1991/17] | English: | Nozzle for continuous casting and method of producing the same | [1991/17] | French: | Busette pour la coulée continue et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1991/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE4003809 (HTM AG [CH]); | [A]DE3510111 (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]); | [AP]EP0353542 (KEMPTEN ELEKTROSCHMELZ GMBH [DE]); | [AD]JPS56139260 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO) |