EP0424897 - Plastic lid for blow moulded plastic barrels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schütz-Werke GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnhofstrasse 25 D-56242 Selters / DE | [1991/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wildfeuer, Eberhard, Dr.-Dipl.-Ing. Tannenweg 23 W-5430 Montabaur-Reckenthal / DE | [1991/18] | Representative(s) | Pürckhauer, Rolf Am Rosenwald 25 57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/18] | Pürckhauer, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Am Rosenwald 25 D-57234 Wilnsdorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120363.8 | 24.10.1990 | [1991/18] | Priority number, date | DE19893935693 | 26.10.1989 Original published format: DE 3935693 | [1991/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0424897 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0424897 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0424897 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/06, B65D1/16, B65D1/46 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B65D43/0218 (EP,US);
B65D45/32 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00416 (EP,US);
B65D2543/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1991/18] | B65D1/16, B65D1/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/37] |
Former [1991/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kunststoffdeckel für blasgeformte Kunststoffässer | [1991/18] | English: | Plastic lid for blow moulded plastic barrels | [1991/18] | French: | Couvercle en plastique pour fûts moulés par soufflage | [1991/18] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3532244 (YATES GEORGE JR); | [AD]DE2544491 (MAUSER KG); | [A]US4331249 (BANICH SR JOHN N); | [A]DE3108442 (MAUSER WERKE GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0315759 (SOTRALENTZ SA [FR]) |