EP0426071 - Semiconductor memory apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states Matsushita Electronics Corporation 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shikata, Michiharu 7-11, Wakakusa 1-chome Kusatsu-shi, Shiga-ken / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/19] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120705.0 | 29.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890283280 | 30.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28328089 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426071 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426071 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426071 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11C7/06 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
G11C7/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/19] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeicheranordnung | [1991/19] | English: | Semiconductor memory apparatus | [1991/19] | French: | Appareil de mémoire à semi-conducteurs | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 01.02.1995 | NL | 01.02.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1995/49] | NL | 01.02.1995 | |
FR | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | FR | 30.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2190808 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP0306712 (IBM [US]) |