EP0426080 - Magnetic recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Takashi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Shoda, Naohiro, c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90120725.8 | 29.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | JP19890281691 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: JP 28169189 | JP19900203916 | 02.08.1990 Original published format: JP 20391690 | [1991/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0426080 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0426080 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426080 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/704 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/73933 (EP,US);
G11B5/7368 (EP,US);
G11B5/73923 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/19] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Aufzeichnungsträger | [1991/19] | English: | Magnetic recording medium | [1991/19] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement magnétique | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 03.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3626216 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0231095 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4707380 (HASHIMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) |