EP0429888 - Method for transmitting a digital wide-band signal in a tributary group system over a network of a synchronous digital multiplex hierarchy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1996 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Dammstrasse 11 W-8021 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | [1991/23] | Application number, filing date | 90121127.6 | 05.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | DE19893939466 | 29.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3939466 | [1991/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0429888 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0429888 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429888 | Date: | 01.02.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/16 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
H04J3/1611 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Übertragung eines digitalen Breitbandsignals in einer Untersystemeinheitenkette über ein Netz einer Synchron-Digital-Multiplexhierarchie | [1995/05] | English: | Method for transmitting a digital wide-band signal in a tributary group system over a network of a synchronous digital multiplex hierarchy | [1991/23] | French: | Méthode de transmission par un réseau multiplex hierarchisé synchrone et numérique d'un signal à large bande distribué entre des unités de transmission subordonnées | [1991/23] |
Former [1991/23] | Verfahren zur Übertragen eines digitalen Breitbandsignals in einer Untersystemeinheitenkette über ein Netz einer Synchron-Digital-Multiplexhierarchie | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 20.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 01.02.1995 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE. Bd. 29, Nr. 3, März 1989, NEW YORK, US Seiten 8 - 15; R. BALLART ET AL.: 'SONET : Now It's the Standard Optical Network' | [A] - IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATION. Bd. SAC-5, Nr. 1, Januar 1987, NEW YORK US Seiten 19 - 25; I. TOKIZAWA ET AL.: 'A Synchronous DS4 Multiplexer with Cross-Connect Function' |