EP0433632 - Method to control an internal combustion engine without throttle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tillhon, Engelbert, Dipl.-Ing. Reisweg 42 W-7128 Lauffen / DE | 02 /
Stutzenberger, Heinz, Dr.-Ing. Schwabstrasse 19/2 W-7143 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | 03 /
Klinke, Christian, Dipl.-Ing. Uferstrasse 7 W-7140 Ludwigsburg-Hoheneck / DE | [1991/26] | Application number, filing date | 90121244.9 | 07.11.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | DE19893940752 | 09.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3940752 | [1991/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0433632 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433632 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02D43/00, F02D37/02, F02D33/00, F02D41/04 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
F02D13/0234 (EP,US);
F02D13/0257 (EP,US);
F02D35/027 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/008 (EP,US);
F02D41/1443 (EP,US);
F02D43/00 (EP,US);
F02P5/045 (EP,US);
F02P5/1502 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0012 (EP,US);
F02D2041/0015 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1991/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Steuern eines Ottomotors ohne Drosselklappe | [1991/26] | English: | Method to control an internal combustion engine without throttle | [1991/26] | French: | Méthode de commande de moteur à combustion interne sans papillon d'admission | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 06.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2134596 ; | [Y]JP5993939 ; | [A]JP60230529 ; | [X]US4009695 (ULE LOUIS A); | [X]US3682152 (MULLER-BERNER ALFRED HERMANN); | [XP]EP0376714 (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]); | [A]US4805571 (HUMPHREY DUANE W [US]) | [Y] - GB-A-2134596 (F.E.V.,FORSCHUNGSGESELLSCHAFT...MBH.), & GB2134596 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 203 (M-326)(1640) 18 September 1984, & JP-A-59 93939 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K.) 30 Mai 1984,, & JP5993939 A 19840918 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 92 (M-468)(2149) 09 April 1986, & JP-A-60 230529 (MAZDA K.K.) 16 November 1985,, & JP60230529 A 19851116 | Examination | GB2134596 |