EP0432462 - Data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOZAN INC. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/38] | For all designated states YOZAN INC. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | ||
For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | |||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states YOZAN INC. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takatori, Sunao, c/o Yozan Inc. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | 02 /
Kumagai, Ryohei, c/o Yozan Inc. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | 03 /
Matsumoto, Koji, c/o Yozan Inc. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Makoto, c/o Yozan Inc. 2-22-2, Koishikawa, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112 / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121492.4 | 09.11.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890297951 | 16.11.1989 Original published format: JP 29795189 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432462 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432462 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/40 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
G06N3/04 (EP,KR)
|
Former IPC [1991/25] | G06F15/80 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1991/25] | English: | Data processing system | [1991/25] | French: | Système de traitement de données | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 04.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 24.04.1996 | IT | 24.04.1996 | NL | 24.04.1996 | SE | 24.07.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 24.04.1996 | |
IT | 24.04.1996 | ||
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | BE | 24.04.1996 | |
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 24.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 27, no. 9, 1st May 1988, pages 1752-1759, New York, US; D. PSALTIS et al.: "Adaptive optical networks using photorefractive crystals" | [X] - KYBERNETIK, vol. 11, no. 3, October 1972, pages 154-156; I. MORISHITA et al.: "Analysis and simulation of networks of mutually inhibiting neurons" |