EP0428962 - Wall footing for an upright profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1-15 D-33609 Bielefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ley, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Diebrocker Strasse 334 W-4900 Herford / DE | 02 /
Freier, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Werster Strasse 91 W-4972 Löhne 4 / DE | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 D-33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121555.8 | 10.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | DE19893938871 | 24.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3938871 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0428962 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0428962 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428962 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/96 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
E04B2/96 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | Fassadenfuss für ein Pfostenprofil | [1991/22] | English: | Wall footing for an upright profile | [1991/22] | French: | Semelle pour montants d'une fassade | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2914145 (RICHARD BENSON RUSSELL); | [A]DE2639552 (HAASE WALTER) | [A] - FRICK/KNÖLL/NEUMANN: "BAUKONSTRUKTIONSLEHRE" 26. Auflage, Teil 1, 1975, Seite 147, B.G. Teubner, Stuttgart, DE |