EP0428963 - Agricultural spreader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.04.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.06.1994 [1994/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 D-49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wiemeyer, Benno Im Sande 6 W-4531 Lotte-Halen / DE | [1991/22] | Application number, filing date | 90121556.6 | 10.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | DE19893938866 | 24.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3938866 | [1991/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428963 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01M7/00 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
A01M7/0053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB [1991/22] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Verteilmaschine | [1991/22] | English: | Agricultural spreader | [1991/22] | French: | Epandeur agricole | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/22] | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2533334 ; | [A]EP0278926 ; | [A]GB2153194 | [A] - MOTORISATION ET TECHNIQUE AGRICOLE no. 50, Februar 1983, Bois-le-Roi, FR Seiten 194 - 227; "Les rampes : des antagonismes à maîtriser" |