EP0428983 - Particle removal from surfaces by pressure change [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. P.O. Box 58039 M/S 0934 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95052-8039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. P.O. Box 58039 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara California 95052-8039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Benjamin Y.H. 1 North Deep Lake Road North Oaks, Minnesota 55127 / US | 02 /
Ahn, Kang Ho 1611 Pleasant Street, Apt. 208 Lauderdale, Minnesota 55108 / US | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th. Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr. Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90121717.4 | 13.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | US19890435097 | 13.11.1989 Original published format: US 435097 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0428983 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0428983 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/67057 (EP);
H01L21/304 (KR);
H01L21/67051 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/22] | Title | German: | Partikelentfernung von Oberflächen durch Druckwechsel | [1991/22] | English: | Particle removal from surfaces by pressure change | [1991/22] | French: | Enlèvement de particules sur des surfaces par modification de pression | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 24.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/12] | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4238244 (BANKS WILLIAM P [US]); | [XP]WO8910803 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US]) |