EP0446428 - Vehicle steering column, built with telescopic tubes, preferably manually adjustable in length [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REICHE & CO. Gasstrasse 15 32791 Lage / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states REICHE & CO. Gasstrasse 15 D-32791 Lage / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnold, Hans Feldstrasse 52 W-4937 Lage / DE | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Stracke, Alexander, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Stracke, Alexander, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Loesenbeck Dipl.-Ing. Stracke Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 Postfach 10 18 82 D-33518 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122373.5 | 23.11.1990 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | DE19904008481 | 16.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008481 | [1991/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0446428 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0446428 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0446428 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/18, B62D1/19 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
B62D1/185 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32483 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7011 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7051 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | B62D1/18 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/38] | Title | German: | Als Teleskoprohr ausgebildete, vorzugsweise durch Handkraft höhenverstellbare Kraftfahrzeuglenksäule | [1991/38] | English: | Vehicle steering column, built with telescopic tubes, preferably manually adjustable in length | [1991/38] | French: | Colonne de direction de véhicule constituée de tubes télescopiques de préférence réglable manuellement en hauteur | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3202669 (REICHE & CO [DE]); | [Y]US4833936 (MARIANI GAETANO [IT], et al); | [A]EP0342350 (REICHE & CO [DE]); | [A]GB2205149 (TORRINGTON CO) |