EP0430188 - Structural member of pipe shape [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LTD. No. 1-1, Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. No. 1-1, Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oonuki, Masahide 722-2, Shimoishino, Bessho-cho Miki-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Tetsuo 3-4, Ishizai-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nakahara, Akihiro 15-22, Ohda 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Miki, Mitsunori 24-402, 3, Minamikoshien 3-chome Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/23] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122685.2 | 27.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | JP19890307050 | 27.11.1989 Original published format: JP 30705089 | JP19900106716 | 23.04.1990 Original published format: JP 10671690 | JP19900210982 | 08.08.1990 Original published format: JP 21098290 | JP19900282419 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28241990 | JP19900289771 | 25.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28977190 | [1991/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0430188 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0430188 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430188 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/00 | [1995/10] | CPC: |
B25J9/0012 (EP,US);
A63B53/10 (EP);
A63B60/00 (US);
B25J18/00 (EP,US);
B29C70/20 (EP,US);
A63B2209/02 (EP,US);
A63B60/06 (EP,US);
A63B60/08 (EP,US);
A63B60/10 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0079 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0082 (EP,US);
B29L2023/22 (EP,US);
B29L2031/5227 (EP,US);
Y10S428/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1314 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1317 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1321 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1386 (EP,US);
Y10T428/139 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1393 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24124 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/36] | B29C67/14, B25J18/00 | ||
Former IPC [1991/35] | B29C67/14, B29C67/14 | ||
Former IPC [1991/23] | B25J18/00, B29C67/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/23] | Title | German: | Rohrförmiges Strukturelement | [1991/23] | English: | Structural member of pipe shape | [1991/23] | French: | Elément de structure en forme de tube | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8704400 (STROEMBERG KARL OTTO); | [X]US4022547 (STANLEY MAX W); | [A]GB1327246 (NAT RES DEV); | [A]US3999886 (ORMISTON ROBERT A, et al) |