EP0487769 - Structure of electric soldering gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Hung-Min NO. 19, Alley 9, Lane 208, Sec. 3, San Min Rd. Taichung / TW | [1992/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/23] | Representative(s) | Dickel, Klaus, et al Zeitler Volpert Kandlbinder Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 26 02 51 80059 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | Dickel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Herrnstrasse 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122723.1 | 28.11.1990 | [1992/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487769 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/06 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
B23K3/0615 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/23] | Title | German: | Struktur einer elektrischen Lötpistole | [1992/23] | English: | Structure of electric soldering gun | [1992/23] | French: | Structure d'un pistolet de brasage électrique | [1992/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 24.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1258086 ; | [A]GB481669 ; | [A]FR2378595 |