EP0430200 - Drug for s.c. or i.m. application containing polypeptides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 35001 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states Behringwerke Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 40 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paques, Eric-Paul, Dr. Schmiedeacker 18 W-3550 Marburg / DE | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/37] |
Former [1992/23] | Fischer, Hans-Jürgen, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1991/23] | Klein, Otto, Dr. Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122730.6 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | DE19893939346 | 29.11.1989 Original published format: DE 3939346 | [1991/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0430200 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430200 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/54, A61K37/02, A61K47/18, // (A61K37/54, 37:02, 31:195) | [1991/23] | CPC: |
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/08 (KR);
A61K38/1816 (EP,US);
A61K38/36 (EP,US);
A61K38/49 (EP,US);
A61K38/58 (EP,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1816, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/1816, A61K31/195 (US,EP);
A61K38/36, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/36, A61K31/195 (US,EP);
A61K38/49, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/49, A61K31/195 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Arzneimittel zur subkutanen oder intramuskulären Applikation enthaltend Polypeptide | [1991/23] | English: | Drug for s.c. or i.m. application containing polypeptides | [1991/23] | French: | Médicament pour application s.c. ou i.m. contenant des polypeptides | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 16.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0156169 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]EP0303251 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US4857320 (WITTWER ARTHUR J [US]) |