EP0432577 - ECL circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugimoto, Yasuhiro, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105 / JP | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90122743.9 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | JP19890311335 | 30.11.1989 Original published format: JP 31133589 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432577 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/086, H03K19/013 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
H03K19/086 (EP,KR,US);
H03K19/0136 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/25] | Title | German: | ECL-Schaltung | [1991/25] | English: | ECL circuit | [1991/25] | French: | Circuit ECL | [1991/25] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 17.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0177278 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]); | [A]EP0293833 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) | [X] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. 24, no. 5, October 1989, pages 1301-1306, New York, US; K.-Y. TOH et al.: "A 23-ps/2.1-mW ECL gate with an AC-coupled active pull-down emitter-follower stage" |