EP0432601 - Electroviscous fluids based on dispersed polyethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1997 [1997/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Udo, Dr. Melanderstrasse 13 W-4047 Dormagen 3 / DE | 02 /
Penners, Gunther, Dr. Körnerstrasse 6 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Oppermann, Günter, Dr. Fichtestrasse 50 W-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Flindt, Roland, Dr. Kalkweg 2 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 05 /
Steinbach, Hans-Horst, Dr. Weyerstrasse 4 W-5253 Lindlar / DE | [1991/25] | Application number, filing date | 90123063.1 | 01.12.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | DE19893941232 | 14.12.1989 Original published format: DE 3941232 | DE19904026880 | 25.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4026880 | [1991/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432601 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432601 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C10M171/00 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
C10M171/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/25] | Title | German: | Elektroviskose Flüssigkeiten auf der Basis dispergierter Polyether | [1991/25] | English: | Electroviscous fluids based on dispersed polyethers | [1991/25] | French: | Fluides électrovisqueux à base de polyéthers dispersés | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0219751 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AD]EP0284268 (ER FLUID DEV [GB]) |