EP0456896 - Package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scheidweiler, Uwe Flashorn 12 W-2087 Hasloh / DE | 02 /
Schultz, Günther Klaus-Nanne-Str. 53 W-2000 Hamburg 61 / DE | [1994/08] |
Former [1991/47] | 01 /
Scheidweiler, Uwe Flashorn 12 W-2087 Hasloh / DE | ||
02 /
Schultz, Günther Klaus-Nann-Strasse 53 W-2000 Hamburg 61 / DE | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 D-20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123187.8 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19900005410U | 12.05.1990 Original published format: DE 9005410 U | [1991/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456896 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456896 | Date: | 23.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/68, B65D5/46 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
B65D5/328 (EP);
B65D5/321 (EP);
B65D5/327 (EP);
B65D5/46072 (EP);
B65D5/68 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Verpackung | [1991/47] | English: | Package | [1991/47] | French: | Emballage | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 23.02.1994 | GB | 23.02.1994 | SE | 23.02.1994 | [1995/03] |
Former [1994/49] | BE | 23.02.1994 | |
SE | 23.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 23.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0235852 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [AD]DE8711991U |