EP0437722 - Control of corrosion in aqueous systems using certain phosphonomethyl amine oxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/36] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | ||
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.) Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwa, Chih Ming 1041 Nightingale Drive Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | 02 /
Kelly, John Arthur 1005 Abbey Drive Crystal Lake, Illinois 60014 / US | 03 /
Neton, Janet 8080 Old Crow Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 04 /
Scanlon, Patricia M. 21 park Circle Arlington, Massachussets 02174 / US | 05 /
Gaudette, Roger R. 2 Clark Street Hudson, New Hampshire 03051 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90123531.7 | 07.12.1990 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | US19890451674 | 15.12.1989 Original published format: US 451674 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437722 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437722 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C23F11/167, C02F5/14 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
C02F5/14 (EP,US);
C23F11/1676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Korrosionskontrolle in wässrigen Systemen durch bestimmte Phosphonomethylaminoxide | [1991/30] | English: | Control of corrosion in aqueous systems using certain phosphonomethyl amine oxides | [1991/30] | French: | Contrôle de la corrosion dans des systèmes aqueux par certains oxydes d'amine phosphonométhylés | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 28.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3429914 (CRUTCHFIELD MARVIN M, et al); | [A]US3474133 (CRUTCHFIELD MARVIN M, et al); | [YP]EP0375385 (GRACE W R & CO [US]); | [AP]US4973744 (HWA CHIH M [US], et al) |