EP0435055 - Time-measuring device for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omega Electronics S.A. 96, Rue Stämpfli 2500 Bienne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states Omega Electronics S.A. 96, Rue Stämpfli CH-2500 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rebetez, Roland Es Planches 138 CH-2842 Rossemaison / CH | 02 /
Voillat, Jean-Pierre Ruelle du Paddock 40 CH-2854 Bassecourt / CH | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | de Raemy, Jacques, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 CH-2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 90123723.0 | 10.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | FR19890017295 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8917295 | [1991/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0435055 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435055 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G07C1/24 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G08G1/123 (EP,US);
G04F10/00 (EP,US);
G04F8/08 (EP,US);
G07C1/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/27] | Title | German: | Zeitmesseinrichtung für Fahrzeuge | [1991/27] | English: | Time-measuring device for vehicles | [1991/27] | French: | Dispositif de chronométrage de mobiles | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 27.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.1994 | ES | 30.11.1994 | GB | 30.11.1994 | IT | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | BE | 31.12.1994 | CH | 31.12.1994 | LI | 31.12.1994 | DE | 01.03.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
GB | 30.11.1994 | ||
IT | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
BE | 31.12.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
GB | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
BE | 31.12.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
GB | 30.11.1994 | ||
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 31.12.1994 | ||
LI | 31.12.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 30.11.1994 | |
DE | 01.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3919686 (NARBAITS-JAUREGUY JEAN-RAYMOND, et al); | [AD]EP0074330 (LONGINES MONTRES COMP D [CH]); | [A]GB2116808 (SENSORMATIC ELECTRONICS CORP); | [A]US4449114 (FASCENDA ANTHONY C [US], et al); | [A]US4495496 (MILLER III SCOTT A [US]); | [A]GB2163324 (ELECTROMATIC); | [AD]FR2619644 (BRACONNIER DOMINIQUE [FR]) |