EP0460292 - Rotatable body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/50] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrä, Rainer-Horst, Dr. Dehrner Strasse 10 W-6250 Limburg 5 / DE | 02 /
Ullrich, Günter Hagenstrasse 22 W-6944 Hemsbach / DE | [1991/50] | Application number, filing date | 90124352.7 | 15.12.1990 | [1991/50] | Priority number, date | DE19904017913 | 02.06.1990 Original published format: DE 4017913 | [1991/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0460292 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/06, F16D1/02, F16D1/08, F16D1/04, F16H55/44, F16H57/02, F04D29/26 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
F16H57/0025 (EP,US);
F04D29/263 (US);
F16D1/02 (US);
F16D1/027 (US);
F16D1/033 (US);
F16D1/05 (US);
F16D1/06 (US);
F16D1/064 (EP,US);
F16D1/072 (US);
F16D1/076 (EP,US);
F16D1/0858 (EP,US);
F16F15/1442 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/50] | Title | German: | Rotationskörper | [1991/50] | English: | Rotatable body | [1991/50] | French: | Corps tournant | [1991/50] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/06] | 14.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE739603 (PINTSCH JULIUS KG); | [A]FR1232031 (GELENKWELLENBAU GMBH); | [A]US3596943 (KRAUSS WALTER FRANCIS); | [Y]EP0048314 (WINKELMANN & PANNHOFF GMBH [DE]); | [X]FR2556286 (GLAENZER SPICER SA [FR]); | [Y]US4807351 (BERG KENNETH R [US], et al); | [X]EP0330930 (EMITEC EMISSIONSTECHNOLOGIE [DE]) |