EP0456907 - High-pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH Hellabrunner Strasse 1 D-81543 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fromm, Dietrich, Dr. Austrasse 7 W-8151 Warngau / DE | 02 /
Hohlfeld, Andreas, Dr. Leibnitzstrasse 87 W-1000 Berlin 12 / DE | [1991/47] | Application number, filing date | 90124462.4 | 17.12.1990 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | DE19904008375 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: DE 4008375 | [1992/07] |
Former [1991/47] | deleted | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0456907 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0456907 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456907 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/073, H01J61/82 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
H01J61/0732 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/47] | Title | German: | Hochdruckentladungslampe | [1991/47] | English: | High-pressure discharge lamp | [1991/47] | French: | Lampe à décharge à haute pression | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/47] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB486138 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [Y]GB491176 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]US3670195 (KAMEGAYA TAKEO, et al); | [A]DE3036746 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]GB2126415 (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH); | [X]EP0213927 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [XP]US4968916 (DAVENPORT JOHN M [US], et al) |