EP0448811 - New pharmaceutical composition with anti-inflammatory activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCLAVO S.p.A. Via Fiorentina 1 I-53123 Siena / IT | [1991/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becherucci, Cristina Via Martiri di Niccioleta, 5 I-58037 Santa Fiora (Prov. of Grosseto) / IT | 02 /
Perretti, Mauro Via Montebello, 35 I-50123 Florence / IT | 03 /
Silvestri, Sergio Via Molizia, 59 I-53100 Siena / IT | 04 /
Parente, Luca Via Fracassi, 20 I-53100 Siena / IT | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Srl Viale Bianca Maria 33 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90124579.5 | 18.12.1990 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | IT19890027791 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: IT 2779189 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0448811 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/00, A61K37/02 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/07 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung mit entzündungswidriger Aktivität | [1991/40] | English: | New pharmaceutical composition with anti-inflammatory activity | [1991/40] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique à l'activité antiinflammatoire | [1991/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/08] | 23.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.02.1993 | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8400108 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]); | [YD]EP0253190 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) |