EP0434059 - Traction control system for automotive vehicle with feature of prediction of road friction level [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/26] | Traction control system for automotive vehicle with feature of road friction level | ||
[1992/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken, 372 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states JAPAN ELECTRONIC CONTROL SYSTEMS CO., LTD. 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken, 372 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazumitsu 1671-1, Kasukawa-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma-ken / NP | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Georg-Kalb-Strasse 9 D-82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124959.9 | 19.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | JP19890329139 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32913989 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434059 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434059 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
B60K28/16 (EP,US);
B60T8/175 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1991/26] | Title | German: | Fahrregelsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit der Eigenschaft der Vorhersage des Reibungskoeffizienten der Strasse | [1992/28] | English: | Traction control system for automotive vehicle with feature of prediction of road friction level | [1992/29] | French: | Système de commande de propulsion pour un véhicule automobile avec l'attribut de prédiction du niveau de friction sur routes | [1991/26] |
Former [1991/26] | Fahrregelsystem für ein Kraftfahrzeug mit der Eigenschaft der Prädiktion des Strassen-Reibungsniveaus | ||
Former [1991/26] | Traction control system for automotive vehicle with feature of road friction level | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0298232 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0310270 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al); | [A]EP0318857 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0321931 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]EP0338538 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) |