EP0434065 - High throughput contrast enhancement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066, M/S A126 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McDonald, Mark 4201 E. Monte Vista No. B-201 Tucson, Arizona / US | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Witte, Alexander Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 14 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
Former [1991/26] | Witte, Alexander, Dr.-Ing. Augustenstrasse 7 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 90124968.0 | 20.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | US19890455115 | 22.12.1989 Original published format: US 455115 | [1991/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0434065 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0434065 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0434065 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
G02F1/133528 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Kontrastverbesserung mit hohem Lichtdurchsatz | [1991/26] | English: | High throughput contrast enhancement | [1991/26] | French: | Amélioration de contraste à faible perte | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Request for further processing for: | 21.07.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 21.07.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   04.06.1993 | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 23.01.1997 | [1997/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2212559 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]WO8403778 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |