EP0439806 - Process for preparing dried filled pasta, and pasta obtained thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cuperus, Hermann Jacob Furtstrasse 4 CH-8700 Kuesnacht / CH | [1991/32] | Application number, filing date | 90125158.7 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | CH19900000346 | 02.02.1990 Original published format: CH 34690 | [1991/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0439806 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0439806 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/16, A23P1/08 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
A23L7/11 (EP,US);
A23P20/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von getrockneten gefüllten Teigprodukten und das so erhaltene Produkt | [1991/32] | English: | Process for preparing dried filled pasta, and pasta obtained thereby | [1991/32] | French: | Procédé de préparation de pâtes farcies séchées et pâtes ainsi obtenues | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1176585 ; | [X]DE8609454U |