EP0435210 - Method for the preparation of methyl chloride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/27] | Method for utilization of carbon tetrachloride in the preparation of methyl chloride | ||
[1994/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Takaaki 3-19, Minami-honcho 3-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Taishi 7, Sanai-cho Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwasaki, Hironori 9-6, Nishi-honcho 3-chome Joetsu-shi Niigata-ken / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Brauneiss, Leo Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 1031 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Brauneiss, Leo, Dipl.Ing. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 90125164.5 | 21.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890339095 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33909589 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435210 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435210 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435210 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/02, C07C17/16 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C07C17/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/16, C07C19/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Methylchlorid | [1994/10] | English: | Method for the preparation of methyl chloride | [1994/10] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de chlorure de méthyle | [1994/10] |
Former [1991/27] | Verfahren zur Benutzung von Kohlenstofftetrachlorid bei der Herstellung von Methylchlorid | ||
Former [1991/27] | Method for utilization of carbon tetrachloride in the preparation of methyl chloride | ||
Former [1991/27] | Procédé pour l'utilisation de tétrachlorure de carbone dans la préparation de chlorure de méthyle | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed. |