EP0436925 - Optical modulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.1997 [1997/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [1991/29] | For:DE
Alcatel SEL Aktiengesellschaft Lorenzstrasse 10 D-7000 Stuttgart 40 / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
AT
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kersten, Peter, Dr. Neuköllner Strasse 8 W-7250 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Wieder, Andreas Olgastrasse 116 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 03 /
Hanisch, Helmut Am langen Hag 15 W-7440 Nürtingen / DE | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Pohl, Herbert, et al Alcatel Alsthom, Intellectual Property Department, P.O. Box 30 09 29 70449 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Pohl, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing, et al Alcatel SEL AG Patent- und Lizenzwesen Postfach 30 09 29 D-70449 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125404.5 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | DE19904000616 | 11.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000616 | [1991/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436925 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436925 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436925 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/29, G02F1/01 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
G02F1/361 (EP);
G02F1/292 (US)
|
Former IPC [1991/29] | G02F1/29 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/29] | Title | German: | Optischer Modulator | [1991/29] | English: | Optical modulator | [1991/29] | French: | Modulateur optique | [1991/29] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 27.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0021967 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. Bd. 64, Nr. 5, September 1988, NEW YORK US Seiten 2749 - 2751; J.R. HILL ET AL.: 'Demonstration of the linear electro-optic effect in a thermopoled polymer film' | [A] - SPIE,VOL 971 PROCEEDINGS "NONLINEAR OPTICAL PROPERTIES OF ORGANIC MATERIALS" 1988 Seiten 218 - 229; R. LYTEL ET AL.: 'Organic electro-optic waveguide modulators and switches' |