EP0457971 - Cooking appliance using steam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1995 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELOMA GmbH BEDARFSARTIKEL ZUR GEMEINSCHAFTSVERPFLEGUNG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 10 D-82216 Maisach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states ELOMA GmbH BEDARFSARTIKEL ZUR GEMEINSCHAFTSVERPFLEGUNG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 10 D-82216 Maisach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spann, Gustav Heinrich-Feller-Strasse 12 W-8080 Emmering / DE | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125549.7 | 27.12.1990 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | DE19904013596 | 27.04.1990 Original published format: DE 4013596 | [1991/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457971 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457971 | Date: | 04.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47J39/00, A47J27/16, B05B7/24, B05B7/00 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
A47J27/16 (EP);
B05B7/0075 (EP);
B05B7/168 (EP);
B05B7/2483 (EP);
F24C15/327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/48] | Title | German: | Dampf-Gargerät | [1991/48] | English: | Cooking appliance using steam | [1991/48] | French: | Appareil de cuisson à vapeur | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 11.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.12.1994 | LI | 31.12.1994 | [1995/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0244538 (LINCOLN FOODSERVICE [US]); | [A]EP0278889 (AIR IND SYSTEMES SA [FR]); | [A]GB542533 (JOHN AMBROSE SADD, et al); | [AD]DE3700894 (ELOMA GMBH [DE]) |