EP0438799 - Rendered façade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUCHEL, Arnold Kanalweg 6 CH-8610 Uster / CH | [1991/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Breiter, Heinz Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach-Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/31] | Breiter, Heinz Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Postfach 366 CH-8413 Neftenbach-Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 90125678.4 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/31] | Priority number, date | CH19900000255 | 26.01.1990 Original published format: CH 25590 | [1991/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438799 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438799 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/76 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
E04B1/7612 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/31] | Title | German: | Verputzte Gebäudewand | [1991/31] | English: | Rendered façade | [1991/31] | French: | Façade crépie | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 17.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.12.1993 | DK | 08.12.1993 | FR | 08.12.1993 | GB | 08.12.1993 | IT | 08.12.1993 | NL | 08.12.1993 | SE | 08.12.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [2000/06] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
DK | 08.12.1993 | ||
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
IT | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
LU | 31.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
DK | 08.12.1993 | ||
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
IT | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
DK | 08.12.1993 | ||
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
FR | 29.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
GB | 08.12.1993 | ||
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 08.12.1993 | |
NL | 08.12.1993 | ||
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/43] | NL | 08.12.1993 | |
SE | 08.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | NL | 08.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1506804 (BACHMAN ROY G); | [A]US2077513 (BUTTRESS GEORGE A); | [A]FR1115932 ; | [A]US4225358 (MAIER SIEGFRIED); | [A]EP0059977 (WILD MICHAEL FA [DE]); | [A]EP0060514 (FINK ALBERT); | [A]FR2529239 (BOISBLUCHE ARSENE [FR]) |