EP0445437 - Burner arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACKERMANN GMBH, TECHNISCHE ANLAGEN UND MASCHINENBAU Marktplatz 16 D-84323 Massing / DE | [1991/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandl, Konrad Eggenfeldener Strasse 5 W-8339 Unterdietfurt / DE | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Hanke, Hilmar, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 80 09 08 81609 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Hanke, Hilmar, et al Patentanwälte Köster & Hanke, Leopoldstrasse 77 D-80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/37] | Hanke, Hilmar Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Hans Köster Dipl.-Ing., Dipl. Wirtsch, Hilmar Hanke Leopoldstrasse 77 D-80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90125799.8 | 29.12.1990 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | DE19900002826U | 09.03.1990 Original published format: DE 9002826 U | [1991/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445437 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445437 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445437 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F23B1/14, F23B3/00, F23L1/02, F23L5/02, F23L9/00, F23K3/14, F23K3/22, F23M5/08 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
F23B90/06 (EP);
F23K3/14 (EP);
F23K3/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/37] | F23B1/14, F23B3/00, F23L5/02, F23L1/02, F23L9/00, F23K3/14, F23K3/22, F23M5/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1991/37] | Title | German: | Brenneranordnung | [1991/37] | English: | Burner arrangement | [1991/37] | French: | Agencement pour brûleur | [1991/37] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/27: Teilanmeldung 93110619.9 eingereicht am 29/12/90 | EPB 1994/27: Divisional application 93110619.9 filed on 29/12/90 | EPB 1994/27: Demande divisionnaire 93110619.9 déposée le 29/12/90 | Examination procedure | 12.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 10.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93110619.9 / EP0569050 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.07.1994 | IT | 06.07.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 06.07.1994 | |
FR | 02.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/28] | FR | 02.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0076353 (DORRENBERG F W VERBRENNTECH [DE]); | [Y]GB2117876 (STONE PLATT FLUIDFIRE LTD); | [Y]FR2571474 (DUPUIS JACQUES [FR]); | [A]FR2580785 (PIEULLE ROBERT [FR]); | [X]DE8809659U |