EP0389009 - Method for determining a leak in a breast wall of a regenerative heat recuperator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.06.1994 [1994/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOOGOVENS GROEP B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [1990/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Praat, Cornelis Nicolaas Antonius Zuidkerkenlaan 8 NL-1906 AC Limmen / NL | 02 /
Veld, Lambertus Koggewaard 37 NL-1824 GL Alkmaar / NL | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Wentzel, Hendrik Cornelis, et al Hoogovens Corporate Services BV, Industrial Property Department, P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Wentzel, Hendrik Cornelis, et al Hoogovens Groep B.V. P.O. Box 10.000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200180.9 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | NL19890000318 | 08.02.1989 Original published format: NL 8900318 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389009 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389009 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389009 | Date: | 16.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C21B9/06, G01M3/22 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
G01M3/228 (EP,US);
C21B9/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Leckprüfung der Zwischenausmauerung eines Regenerativerhitzers | [1990/39] | English: | Method for determining a leak in a breast wall of a regenerative heat recuperator | [1990/39] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer une fuite dans la paroi intérieure d'un réchauffeur à récupération | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 02.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0184521 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]US3522008 (DEFABAUGH CHARLES E, et al); | [A]US3087064 (CURTICE JAY S, et al) | [A] - STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 106, no. 18, 8th September 1986, pages 75-80, Düsseldorf, DE; H. KREIMES et al.: "Ausbrandverbesserung für keramische Winderhitzerbrenner" | Examination | - STAHL UND EISEN, vol. 106, no. 18, 08 September 1986, Seiten 75-80, Düsseldorf, DE; H.KREIMES et al.: "Ausbrandverbesserung für keramische Winderhitzerbrenner" |