EP0389026 - Deep-freezing and preservation unit for food products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASTEL MAC S.p.A. Via del Lavoro, 9 I-31033 Castelfranco Veneto (Treviso) / IT | [1990/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Portelli, Paolo Via d'Acquisto 7 I-31021 Mogliano Veneto (Treviso) / IT | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90200553.7 | 09.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | IT19890019882 | 23.03.1989 Original published format: IT 1988289 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389026 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389026 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F25D17/06, F25D29/00 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
F25D17/06 (EP);
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25D2317/0682 (EP);
F25D2400/10 (EP);
F25D2400/36 (EP);
F25D2700/122 (EP);
F25D2700/123 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Gefrier- und Aufbewahrungseinheit für Nahrungsmittel | [1990/39] | English: | Deep-freezing and preservation unit for food products | [1990/39] | French: | Unité de surgélation et de conservation pour des produits alimentaires | [1990/39] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/09] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2462279 (CHARLES PASSMAN); | [A]DE944495 (ESCHER WYSS WERKE LINDAU GES M); | [A]DE2155758 ; | [A]FR2468314 (PONT P [FR]) |