EP0390250 - Phase detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:DE
FR
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:DE
FR
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Summers, Christopher Paul c/o Philips Components, New Road, Mitcham Junction Mitcham, Surrey, CR4 4XY / GB | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Andrews, Arthur Stanley, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [1990/40] | Cole, Bernard Victor PHILIPS ELECTRONICS Patents and Trade Marks Department Philips House 188 Tottenham Court Road London W1P 9LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90200620.4 | 16.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | GB19890006585 | 22.03.1989 Original published format: GB 8906585 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390250 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390250 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/087, H03D13/00, H03L7/089, H04N5/12 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/126 (EP,US);
H03D13/002 (EP,US);
H03D13/004 (EP,US);
H03L7/085 (EP,US);
H03L7/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/40] | Title | German: | Phasendetektoren | [1990/40] | English: | Phase detectors | [1990/40] | French: | Détecteurs de phase | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 31.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0199448 (SPERRY CORP [US]) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 27, no. 1A, June 1984, NEW YORK US pages 355 - 357; J.W. RAE AND D.P. SWART: "Variable Frequency Oscillator Using A Frequency Discriminator" |